Financial history FRIENDS OF ROCKLANDS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1023336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £2.99k £513 £1.37k £2.20k £7.44k
Total expenditure £4.35k £20 £1.33k £3.73k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A