Financial history KNODISHALL AND DISTRICT PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1023626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £102.51k £90.28k £95.13k £148.65k £102.82k
Total expenditure £70.20k £67.06k £77.71k £81.82k £90.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £82.09k £83.02k
Income from government grants £64.48k £74.16k N/A £250 N/A