Financial history FORNCETT PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1024080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £27.90k £35.52k £73.55k £69.89k £43.16k
Total expenditure £41.43k £37.13k £42.71k £57.31k £108.17k
Income from government contracts N/A £28.59k N/A £60.57k £35.76k
Income from government grants £1.06k N/A £42.70k N/A N/A