Financial history BEANSHEAF COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1024607
Charity reporting is overdue by 1764 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £93.22k £102.39k £99.57k £89.80k £90.45k
Total expenditure £110.49k £102.31k £99.54k £84.15k £82.21k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £71.94k £72.83k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £0 £0 £80.14k