OKEHAMPTON DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of transport facilities for the elderly, disabled, poor, mothers with young children or people living in isolated areas where there are no adequate public transport facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,400 from 1 government contract(s) and £26,170 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 06 August 1993: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY CARS (Working name)
- RING & RIDE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Frank Leech | Chair | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Clements | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Goffey | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|||||
George Herbert Dexter | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Anthony Robinson | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Lyn Evans | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HARDING | Trustee | 11 July 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.99k | £82.25k | £114.49k | £93.13k | £104.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.10k | £73.37k | £93.81k | £107.28k | £109.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £17.64k | £21.30k | £21.84k | £22.49k | £23.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.14k | £24.60k | £29.69k | £28.26k | £26.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 APRIL 1990 AND AMENDED 29 APRIL 1993 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 25 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY OR DISABLED, POOR, MOTHERS WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR PEOPLE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
OKEHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING RURAL DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 3
Okehampton Business Centre
Higher Stockley Mead
OKEHAMPTON
Devon
EX20 1FJ
- Phone:
- 0183755000
- Email:
- sue.odctg@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window