Financial history OMBERSLEY CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1025044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £674.89k £491.17k £601.51k £626.47k £1.73m
Total expenditure £401.46k £417.27k £537.91k £877.50k £742.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £40.49k N/A £0 £0 £105.00k
Income - Other trading activities £2.64k N/A £4.23k £4.67k £4.16k
Income - Charitable activities £619.16k N/A £596.84k £613.59k £699.63k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.59k N/A £445 £8.21k £26.05k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £897.74k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £306.43k N/A £463.98k £783.76k £611.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £95.04k N/A £73.93k £93.73k £130.69k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £9.58k £127.08k £17.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £37.94k N/A £36.30k £9.20k £36.44k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £88.97k £86.88k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0