Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF YORK CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1025046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £123.96k £70.35k £122.80k £133.08k £139.44k
Total expenditure £129.47k £71.84k £122.31k £130.92k £132.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A