Financial history BLETCHINGLEY (AFTERNOON) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1025177
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014
Total gross income £4.00k £2.94k £3.21k £5.22k £2.74k
Total expenditure £4.46k £3.17k £3.55k £3.15k £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A