Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HEREFORD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1025302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £99.43k £31.73k £24.90k £28.44k £18.31k
Total expenditure £67.10k £49.96k £44.98k £13.13k £24.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A