LEICESTER PRINT WORKSHOP STUDIOS AND RESOURCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leicester Print Workshop is a centre for fine art printmaking with a regional remit. It offers an extensive education programme in schools, colleges, community groups and for artists and enthusiasts. The charity provides affordable facilities in its Leicester based studio and provides specialist technical support to users. It also runs an exhibitions programme within and outside the east Midlands
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £88,186 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 23 August 1993: Standard registration
- LEICESTER PRINT WORKSHOP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Budworth | Chair | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Margaret Wright | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Anna Maria Kambasha | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
CATHARINE ELIZABETH HODGES | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean McMeakin | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Yu Lu | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.41k | £248.46k | £178.38k | £195.60k | £206.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £282.15k | £183.92k | £221.94k | £267.42k | £244.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.50k | £71.58k | £71.58k | £88.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS (FOR FURTHER INFORMATION PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leicester Print Workshop
50 St. George Street
LEICESTER
LE1 1QG
- Phone:
- 01162514174
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window