Financial history CUMBRIAN RAILWAYS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1025436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £23.49k £24.68k £28.36k £33.46k £25.61k
Total expenditure £25.65k £21.61k £23.67k £29.01k £22.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A