Trustees CUMBRIAN RAILWAYS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1025436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Pickup Trustee 15 March 2025
BURWARTON AND CLEOBURY NORTH VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Eliot Andersen Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
DAVID ANDREW HUNTER Trustee 19 March 2021
None on record
BARRY STEPHENSON Trustee 17 March 2018
None on record
MICHAEL WARHURST Trustee 19 March 2016
None on record
Ken Harper Trustee 27 March 2014
None on record
MICHAEL PEASCOD Trustee
None on record
PHILIP T TUER Trustee
None on record