LEWISHAM EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1025785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of education of persons under the age of 25 years whose parents are resident in the area of benefit and who are in need of financial assistance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,482
Total expenditure: £1,312

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 September 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Latouche Trustee 19 May 2024
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
Alex Brooks Trustee 29 January 2024
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
Alison Munro Trustee 29 January 2024
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
Winston Lucas Trustee 24 October 2023
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ROY BROWN Trustee 23 October 2018
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
ST MARY LEWISHAM YOUTH CENTRE
Received: 73 days late
Joan Kalchetar McKenzie Trustee 18 March 2018
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, LEWISHAM
Received: On time
Jennifer Lorraine Henry Trustee 02 April 2017
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, LEWISHAM
Received: On time
STELLA JANET JEFFREY Trustee
LEWISHAM CHURCHES FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS
Received: On time
THE LONDON CHURCHES FUND FOR DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
Julian Watson Trustee
ELIZA ANN SMITH
Received: On time
ST MARY LEWISHAM YOUTH CENTRE
Received: 73 days late
COUNTESS OF DARTMOUTH AND OTHERS
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
ESTATE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.26k £1.31k £1.45k £1.44k £1.48k
Total expenditure £896 £789 £1.44k £433 £1.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Clerks Office, Lloyd Court
Slagrove Place
LONDON
SE13 7LP
Phone:
02086908145