Financial history SPRINGBOARD OPPORTUNITY GROUP

Charity Number: 1025787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £522.86k £589.55k £671.10k £762.18k £835.99k
Total expenditure £519.28k £585.09k £621.64k £730.90k £805.51k
Income from government contracts £100.70k £100.73k £100.73k £100.73k £105.34k
Income from government grants £43.06k £43.32k £20.21k £258.20k £407.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £151.65k £255.21k £218.33k £250.78k £762.16k
Income - Other trading activities £7.30k £1.85k £11.00k £27.75k £46.13k
Income - Charitable activities £363.32k £332.35k £436.31k £481.08k £1.15k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £585 £136 £199 £2.57k £5.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £5.26k £0 £21.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £518.88k £584.15k £620.79k £721.74k £804.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds £403 £942 £854 £9.16k £1.13k
Expenditure - Governance £1.76k £1.91k £4.63k £3.61k £4.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0