Financial history CARLETON RODE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1026583
Charity reporting is overdue by 320 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £53.05k £54.63k £61.25k £70.60k £63.76k
Total expenditure £60.73k £54.20k £56.06k £68.31k £69.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £34.55k £46.96k £33.16k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.00k N/A