Financial history KING'S CLIFFE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1028127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.49k £28.58k £14.00k £19.40k £16.56k
Total expenditure £17.84k £18.12k £12.97k £13.78k £13.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £600 £2.67k N/A