Financial history WESTON CHURCH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1028297
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £58.52k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £69.27k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £299 N/A N/A N/A N/A