Financial history RUSSIAN LANGUAGE UNDERGRADUATE STUDIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1028482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £303.95k £162.12k £312.96k £289.04k £366.14k
Total expenditure £321.85k £162.79k £351.85k £291.78k £359.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A