Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF ROMSEY TEST TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1029525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £104.22k £45.37k £59.22k £108.53k £111.49k
Total expenditure £97.05k £51.69k £61.04k £96.15k £128.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £400 N/A