Financial history CLWYD COUNTY GUIDES

Charity number: 1029693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £46.54k £38.92k £20.02k £24.78k £50.70k
Total expenditure £35.78k £21.71k £10.46k £25.59k £44.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £4.00k N/A £10.00k