Trustees CLWYD COUNTY GUIDES
Charity number: 1029693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE DUFFIELD | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aletia Rogers | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Evans | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Lovegrove-Jones | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lloyd | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Taylor | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA HUNT | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanna Rachel Ritchie | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Quayle | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Margaret Pigott | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Fox | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Williams | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Megan Andrea Jones | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.