Financial history ASTON AND COTE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1030148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.50k £0 £2.81k £4.20k £2.20k
Total expenditure £4.41k £854 £2.28k £4.17k £2.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A