Accounts and annual returns DMA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1030577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 May 2025 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 May 2025 471 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 May 2025 836 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 May 2025 1201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 November 2022 666 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required