Trustees PRESHUTE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1030823

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florence Hanson | Chair | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ruth Flaherty | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mairead Redmond | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Bendall | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy McLaughlin | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Staples | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fernanda Lopes | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARA CLARK | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ILSE SCHEEPERS | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Colbourne | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA BAUER | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.