Financial history INNER WHEEL CLUB OF LEIGH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1031028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £661 £350 £714 £624 £751
Total expenditure £300 £850 £1.20k £593 £350
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A