Little Explorers Pre-School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide high quality childcare for the Colchester area. The Pre-School is based in the Greenstead Community centre. We are open 38 weeks per year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £84,082 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 07 January 1994: Standard registration
- LITTLE EXPLORERS PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- THE PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- GREENSTEAD SOCIAL CLUB PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Burnett | Chair | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Swannell | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Hurrell | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Butler | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Eaton | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Julie Gardner | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/09/2020 | 05/09/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.16k | £89.14k | £72.21k | £79.15k | £89.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.17k | £88.09k | £61.68k | £63.08k | £71.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £72.76k | £63.60k | £74.05k | £84.08k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1993 as amended on 21 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GREENSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENSTEAD COMMUNITY CENTRE
HAWTHORN AVENUE
COLCHESTER
CO4 3QE
- Phone:
- 07902000264
- Email:
- littleexplorers@sky.com
- Website:
-
littleexplorers3.wixsite.com/website
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window