Financial history SHERBORNE IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1031238
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £23.77k £31.63k £21.28k £23.53k £29.80k
Total expenditure £21.81k £26.92k £13.99k £30.35k £27.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A