Financial history Neuro Therapy Network Limited

Charity Number: 1031690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £73.31k £33.77k £31.04k £16.83k £29.46k
Total expenditure £90.98k £54.68k £58.51k £52.67k £74.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A