Financial history FRIENDS OF CHARBOROUGH ROAD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1032475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/09/2020 26/09/2021 26/09/2022 26/09/2023 26/09/2024
Total gross income £5.15k £2.96k £9.57k £9.01k £9.42k
Total expenditure £8.10k £1.90k £8.35k £13.17k £5.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A