Trustees HAMPSHIRE FOUNDATION FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS
Charity number: 1032598

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Chapman MBE | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Larner | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jesty | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES CARPENTER | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARL CLAUSEN | Trustee | 21 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN EVES | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREK GEOFFREY ANTHONY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY LOUISA CAROLINE PORTAL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.