Financial history RUDGWICK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033175
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £76.08k £92.10k £76.65k £93.24k £88.18k
Total expenditure £78.93k £80.01k £85.40k £92.29k £102.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £42.79k £69.46k £54.52k £58.88k N/A