FRIENDS OF ST DUNSTAN'S PARISH CHURCH MAYFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises funds for the maintenance of the fabric of St Dunstan's Parish Church Mayfield East Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
Governance
- 23 February 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST DUNSTAN'S (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNETTE NABAVI | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Andrew Jeremy Carruthers Smither | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Miles Smith | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Michael John Asquith | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Stephen Richard Blurton | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Robin Ian Charles Howden | Trustee | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
CHARLES HOWE MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MR STEPHEN SWANTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/05/2020 | 18/05/2021 | 18/05/2022 | 18/05/2023 | 18/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.64k | £35.70k | £5.24k | £7.78k | £8.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £0 | £24.43k | £433 | £80 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 May 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 May 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 May 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 May 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 May 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING WITH THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC, INTERIOR DECORATIONS AND FURNISHINGS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF MAYFIELD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE MAYFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODREED FARM
STONEHURST LANE
FIVE ASHES
MAYFIELD
TN20 6LJ
- Phone:
- 07710482448
- Email:
- c.h.marshall@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window