Financial history ISFIELD VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 1034030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £19.23k £35.38k £18.76k £27.85k £26.51k
Total expenditure £7.99k £15.62k £15.93k £17.53k £13.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.30k £20.59k N/A N/A N/A