Financial history LITTLE ROBINS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £97.86k £119.16k £118.99k £118.67k £128.34k
Total expenditure £107.75k £106.95k £126.32k £126.56k £128.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £101.96k £109.18k £105.98k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.60k £3.11k £5.42k