Financial history TREADAM BARN TRUST

Charity Number: 1034885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/02/2020 20/02/2021 20/02/2022 20/02/2023 20/02/2024
Total gross income £19.57k £15.17k £15.95k £28.15k £15.87k
Total expenditure £19.66k £10.17k £284 £40.43k £6.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A