LOWICK YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity Number: 1034908
Charity reporting is overdue by 1786 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012

Total income: £8,867
Total expenditure: £6,071

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ben Cooper Chair 17 June 2020
None on record
Leah Clough Trustee 17 June 2020
None on record
ALICE LONGMIRE Trustee 17 June 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £7.81k £16.25k £14.87k £10.85k £8.87k
Total expenditure £7.41k £16.25k £14.87k £10.25k £6.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1056 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1056 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1421 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1421 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1786 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1786 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Nettleslack Farm
Broughton Beck
ULVERSTON
Cumbria
LA12 7PN
Phone:
07881882940
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available