Trustees LLANELLI UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1035287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Yeo Poulton Chair 22 September 2020
None on record
Roger Williams Trustee 05 March 2024
None on record
Dr Claire Hilary Firth Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Maria Rosario Chidzoy Trustee 26 July 2022
None on record
John Henry Russell Williams Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Paul Follows Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Paul Anthony Cullen Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record
Keith Henry David Vincent Trustee 25 July 2017
None on record