WOODSTOCK MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presentation of choral and orchestral concerts, mainly in Woodstock, occasionally in Oxford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HUGH MORNINGTON CLARK | Chair | 06 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Richard Colin Sills | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stephen Boxall | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanna Jeannette Tomlin | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth McDonald Sutherland | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR GILLIANE CHRISTINE SILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVELYN HENDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOUGLAS FAWCETT MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOHN FREDERICK MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.69k | £22.60k | £2.24k | £26.39k | £31.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.18k | £18.85k | £5.04k | £25.27k | £25.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 1981, 9 JUNE 1994, 5 JUNE 1997 AND 29 JANUARY 2004. AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2017 as amended on 10 Mar 2022 as amended on 10 Nov 2022 as amended on 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Barn House
Church Lane
Lower Heyford
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX25 5NZ
- Phone:
- 01869340630
- Email:
- concerts@woodstockmusic.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window