Financial history THE TUDOR CAMPION FUND

Charity Number: 1035990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.60k £10.85k £10.89k £11.14k £11.14k
Total expenditure £5.97k £5.25k £3.70k £15.01k £4.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A