Financial history SPENNYMOOR TOWN COUNCIL MAYORS CHARITY

Charity number: 1036218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/05/2020 24/05/2021 24/05/2022 24/05/2023 24/05/2024
Total gross income £5.58k £1.72k £3.77k £9.12k £14.00k
Total expenditure £5.58k £1.72k £3.77k £9.12k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A