The C T Thomas Trust

Charity number: 1036285
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of donations for any charitable purpose considered suitable by the trustees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £91,878
Total expenditure: £114,875

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE COUPE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Charles CHAMPION Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Christopher Morley Trustee 16 September 2021
THE MORLEY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Jane Veronica Barbara Newton Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record
NICHOLAS EWEN WALKER Trustee 28 July 2012
None on record
MR A J DALE Trustee
TENBURY COMMUNITY EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
TENBURY COMMUNITY POOL
Received: On time
LODGE OF ST.MICHAEL CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURFORD TRUST
Received: On time
TENBURY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Received: On time
TENBURY YOUTH CAFE
Received: On time
MISS S R COUPE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £469.25k £98.14k £184.83k £90.10k £91.88k
Total expenditure £401.45k £55.07k £123.26k £77.13k £114.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 March 2025 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 March 2025 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 October 2024 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 October 2024 250 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 March 2023 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 March 2023 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 June 2021 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 June 2021 128 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Crocus Corner
Station Close
Newnham Bridge
Tenbury Wells
WR15 8PG
Phone:
01584781033
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available