THE NATIONAL BOTANIC GARDEN OF WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Botanic Garden
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,447,064
Donations and legacies | £1.01m | |
Charitable activities | £1.89m | |
Other trading activities | £1.53m | |
Investments | £23.17k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,261,965
Raising funds | £1.54m | |
Charitable activities | £3.72m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £943,606 from 11 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.54m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.72m |
People

79 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
249 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 12 April 1994: Standard registration
- 19 December 2023: Funds received from 517350 BRECKNOCK GARDENING ASSOCIATION
- MIDDLETON BOTANIC GARDEN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Davies | Chair | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Louise Burns | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Isobel Miles | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Cheryl Childs | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Daniel Taylor | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Iain Donnison | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Pete Wall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sara Matthews | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy William Jones | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|||||||
Dr Paul Philip Smith | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Michael Ian Woods | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Derek Anthony Howell | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.43m | £4.98m | £6.14m | £5.33m | £4.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82m | £4.35m | £5.26m | £5.21m | £5.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.44m | £1.72m | £3.01m | £2.11m | £943.61k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.43m | £1.03m | £772.98k | £795.88k | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £978.03k | £407.24k | £1.16m | £1.34m | £1.53m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.02m | £3.54m | £4.21m | £3.18m | £1.89m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.63k | £3.14k | £2.74k | £11.03k | £23.17k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £9.97k | £4.99k | £5.96k | £0 | £107.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.90m | £4.04m | £4.19m | £3.89m | £3.72m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £918.00k | £317.21k | £1.08m | £1.32m | £1.54m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £12.50k | £12.03k | £13.98k | £297 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £26.12m | £26.26m | £25.84m | £26.35m | £25.63m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.89m | £2.25m | £2.45m | £2.07m | £1.45m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.32m | £2.20m | £1.11m | £1.11m | £580.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/08/1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/06/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/12/2015
Charitable objects
(THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE, TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE OF PLANTS AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND THE CONSERVATION OF PLANT SPECIES OF THE WORLD ESPECIALLY THOSE OF WALES, GREAT BRITAIN AND WESTERN EUROPEAN SEABOARD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) THE ESTABLISHMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A NATIONAL BOTANIC GARDEN FOR WALES OPEN TO THE PUBLIC; (B) THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A NATIONAL CONSERVATION ASSET OF LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL PLANT SPECIES; (C) THE DEVELOPMENT OF A CENTRE FOR RESEARCH IN PLANT BIODIVERSITY AND THE CREATION OF AN EXEMPLAR OF GOOD HORTICULTURAL PRACTICE; (D) THE PROVISION OF FORMAL AND INFORMAL EDUCATION AND INTERPRETATION EXPERIENCES FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND ABILITIES PARTICULARLY TO ENHANCE UNDERSTANDING OF THE INTERACTION OF PEOPLE, PLANTS, LANDSCAPE AND THE ENVIRONMENT IN A SUSTAINABLE FUTURE; AND (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF WELSH CULTURE AND HISTORICAL HERITAGE BY THE RESTORATION OF THE HISTORIC LANDSCAPED ENVIRONMENT AND BUILDING AT THE SITE OF THE NATIONAL BOTANIC GARDEN REFERRED TO IN (I)(A) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MIDDLETON HALL
LLANARTHNE
CARMARTHENSHIRE
SA32 8HG
- Phone:
- 01558667102
- Email:
- account@gardenofwales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window