Financial history THE RIDLEY HALL

Charity number: 1036551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.58k £23.94k £31.02k £19.43k £20.61k
Total expenditure £31.52k £15.02k £10.61k £13.45k £18.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £16.57k N/A £162