Trustees THE RIDLEY HALL
Charity number: 1036551

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RICHARD KENNETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip William Elston Diggens | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Phelan | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Armstrong | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Isaac Fairhead | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Rochfort Garrard | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin McBride | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Hall | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY CLAYTON BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.