Trustees THE FRIENDS OF NASSINGTON SCHOOL
Charity number: 1036954

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Cook | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Majendie | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Churchman | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jennings | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Rose | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Thorley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Atkins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Robinson | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexa Campbell | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Stockley | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mason | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jayne Roberts | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joy Louise Forster | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.