Financial history THE ELEOS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1037105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.34k £7.70k £14.30k £18.63k £9.40k
Total expenditure £7.97k £7.28k £10.50k £21.99k £8.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A