Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF WATFORD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1037547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.15k £11.58k £19.59k £20.91k £45.93k
Total expenditure £15.52k £7.89k £18.40k £19.72k £46.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A