Trustees ROTARY CLUB OF WATFORD TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1037547

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RABI FILOMENO MARTINS | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Hammond | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Wellham | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Silverston | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|||||
David Anthony Charman | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Goates | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.