Financial history AIDS IMPACT

Charity number: 1037703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £399 £7.14k £1.96k £114.12k £2.49k
Total expenditure £19.89k £27.42k £14.40k £37.76k £36.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A