BOURNEMOUTH CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1037765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of Chamber Music Concerts

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £11,476
Total expenditure: £15,053

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 May 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • B C M S (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JILL MARGARET WHITE Trustee 29 September 2022
BOURNEMOUTH SYMPHONY CHORUS
Received: On time
Christina Thomas Trustee 29 July 2021
None on record
Carolyn Date Trustee 25 September 2020
None on record
John Colvin Trustee 01 January 2012
None on record
Ros Horsfall-Turner Trustee 01 January 2012
None on record
Carolyn Butterworth Trustee 01 January 2012
None on record
DAVID MIDDLETON Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL DAVID READ Trustee
None on record
ROSEMARY ALLEN Trustee
None on record
TERENCE RICKETS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £13.83k £1.05k £14.00k £14.05k £11.48k
Total expenditure £12.11k £451 £10.93k £18.34k £15.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Ribbonwood Heights
Blair Avenue
POOLE
POOLE
Dorset
Phone:
01202 745516